TX HR37 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of Hall Electric in Victoria.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of Hall Electric in Victoria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-07 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-07-18 | House | Filed |