TX HR366 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Penelope Bankston on being named principal of Parkland High School in El Paso.
Title
Congratulating Penelope Bankston on being named principal of Parkland High School in El Paso.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-10 | House | Filed |