TX HR336 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Eric Johnson for his service on the Pilot Point Independent School District Board of Trustees.
Title
Commending Eric Johnson for his service on the Pilot Point Independent School District Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-09 | House | Filed |