TX HR3335 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending local, state, and federal law enforcement officers for their swift and forceful response to the incident in Waco on May 17, 2015.
Title
Commending local, state, and federal law enforcement officers for their swift and forceful response to the incident in Waco on May 17, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-27 | House | Filed |