TX HR3294 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Deisy Martinez on her graduation from Pasadena Early College High School as a member of the Class of 2015.
Title
Congratulating Deisy Martinez on her graduation from Pasadena Early College High School as a member of the Class of 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-05-26 | House | Filed |