TX HR328 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Oak Cliff on the occasion of the 107th anniversary of its annexation to Dallas.
Title
Honoring Oak Cliff on the occasion of the 107th anniversary of its annexation to Dallas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-06 | Filed |