TX HR3174 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Roderick Taylor for his service as a McClendon Scholar in the office of State Representative Armando Martinez during the 84th Texas Legislature.
Title
Honoring Roderick Taylor for his service as a McClendon Scholar in the office of State Representative Armando Martinez during the 84th Texas Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-05-23 | House | Filed |