TX HR2897 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Commending Daniela Santoni for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Roberto Alonzo.
Title
Commending Daniela Santoni for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Roberto Alonzo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Adopted | |
2009-06-01 | Laid before the House | |
2009-06-01 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-31 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-30 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-29 | Filed |