TX HR2889 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Marisol Martinez, valedictorian of the Class of 2015 at Collegiate High School in Corpus Christi.
Title
Congratulating Marisol Martinez, valedictorian of the Class of 2015 at Collegiate High School in Corpus Christi.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-05-15 | House | Filed |