TX HR2889 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Delores Turner on her retirement as supervisor in the audit division of the Texas comptroller's office.
Title
Congratulating Delores Turner on her retirement as supervisor in the audit division of the Texas comptroller's office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-25 | House | Filed |