TX HR2840 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Mary Catherine Love for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Tommy Merritt.
Title
Honoring Mary Catherine Love for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Tommy Merritt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Adopted | |
2009-06-01 | Laid before the House | |
2009-06-01 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-31 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-29 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-28 | Filed |