TX HR280 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing October 21, 2017, as Hoverboard Safety Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing October 21, 2017, as Hoverboard Safety Awareness Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-15HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-14HouseAdopted
2017-08-14HouseRules suspended
2017-08-11HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-08-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback