TX HR278 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing March 2023 as National Women's History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing March 2023 as National Women's History Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - House - Adopted RV#45 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16HouseReported enrolled
2023-03-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-03-08HouseRecord vote RV#45
2023-03-08HouseAdopted
2023-03-08HouseLaid before the House
2023-03-08HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-03-06HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-03-01HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-02-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback