TX HR277 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of The University of Texas at El Paso president emerita Dr. Diana Natalicio.
Title
In memory of The University of Texas at El Paso president emerita Dr. Diana Natalicio.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-16 | House | Filed |