TX HR275 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Roy Brooks of the Tarrant County Commissioners Court on his election as president of the National Association of Counties.
Title
Congratulating Roy Brooks of the Tarrant County Commissioners Court on his election as president of the National Association of Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-14 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-08 | House | Filed |