TX HR261 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

In memory of Jim Brunjes of Lubbock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memory of Jim Brunjes of Lubbock.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseReported enrolled
2023-03-08HouseAdopted
2023-03-08HouseLaid before the House
2023-03-08HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-03-06HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-03-01HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback