TX HR2370 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the life of U.S. Army Lieutenant Colonel (Ret.) Paul Peter Mendes of The Woodlands.
Title
Honoring the life of U.S. Army Lieutenant Colonel (Ret.) Paul Peter Mendes of The Woodlands.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-25 | House | Filed |