TX HR2345 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Cassidy Taylor Zgabay for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Dwayne Bohac.
Title
Commending Cassidy Taylor Zgabay for her service as an intern in the office of State Representative Dwayne Bohac.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-23 | House | Filed |