TX HR2333 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Naomi Narvaiz of San Marcos on her 50th birthday.
Title
Congratulating Naomi Narvaiz of San Marcos on her 50th birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Isaac [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-22 | House | Filed |