TX HR2317 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Yvette Mendoza for her service as a legislative intern in the office of State Representative Will Metcalf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Yvette Mendoza for her service as a legislative intern in the office of State Representative Will Metcalf.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-29HouseAdopted
2023-05-29HouseRules suspended
2023-05-26HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback