TX HR224 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 70th anniversary of the Beta Upsilon Chapter of Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc.
Title
Commemorating the 70th anniversary of the Beta Upsilon Chapter of Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-07 | House | Filed |