TX HR2233 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring C. Wayne Nance of Waco for his service in the U.S. Army during World War II.
Title
Honoring C. Wayne Nance of Waco for his service in the U.S. Army during World War II.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-22 | House | Filed |