TX HR2197 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the dedication of a statue to World War II veteran and former Texas A&M president James Earl Rudder on June 6, 2019, in Brady.
Title
Commemorating the dedication of a statue to World War II veteran and former Texas A&M president James Earl Rudder on June 6, 2019, in Brady.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Filed |