TX HR2180 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Roshauud Paul of Bremond High School on earning the 2016 Mr. Texas Football High School Player of the Year Award.
Title
Congratulating Roshauud Paul of Bremond High School on earning the 2016 Mr. Texas Football High School Player of the Year Award.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Filed |