TX HR2145 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the participants in the 2017 Rio Grande Valley Legislative Internship Program.
Title
Honoring the participants in the 2017 Rio Grande Valley Legislative Internship Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Rene Oliveira [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-15 | House | Filed |