TX HR2129 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Dr. Fred M. Zaunbrecher on being named a 2009 Unsung Hero by the Galveston County Daily News.
Title
Congratulating Dr. Fred M. Zaunbrecher on being named a 2009 Unsung Hero by the Galveston County Daily News.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Adopted | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-15 | Filed |