TX HR211 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Roma Middle School Symphonic Winds ensemble on performing at the 2016 Midwest Clinic International Band, Orchestra and Music Conference in Chicago.
Title
Congratulating the Roma Middle School Symphonic Winds ensemble on performing at the 2016 Midwest Clinic International Band, Orchestra and Music Conference in Chicago.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-03 | House | Filed |