TX HR2108 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Sigma chapter of Delta Epsilon Mu at The University of Texas at Austin for its community service.
Title
Commending the Sigma chapter of Delta Epsilon Mu at The University of Texas at Austin for its community service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-12 | House | Filed |