TX HR2105 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending U.S. Army Private Heather Row for her desire to serve her country.
Title
Commending U.S. Army Private Heather Row for her desire to serve her country.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Adopted | |
2011-05-26 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-18 | Filed |