TX HR2085 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the former Midland County judges being recognized at the 2017 Judicial Heritage Ceremony.
Title
Honoring the former Midland County judges being recognized at the 2017 Judicial Heritage Ceremony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-11 | House | Filed |