TX HR2064 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Margaret Olivarez of Copperfield Elementary School on being named the 2019 District Elementary Humanitarian of the Year by the Pflugerville Independent School District.
Title
Congratulating Margaret Olivarez of Copperfield Elementary School on being named the 2019 District Elementary Humanitarian of the Year by the Pflugerville Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-22 | House | Filed |