TX HR2044 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Michael "Spanky" Stephens on his induction into the Kinesiology and Health Education Hall of Honor at The University of Texas at Austin.
Title
Congratulating Michael "Spanky" Stephens on his induction into the Kinesiology and Health Education Hall of Honor at The University of Texas at Austin.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Filed |