TX HR2042 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the speaker to direct the House Agriculture and Livestock Committee to conduct an interim study reviewing the rules, regulations, and enforcement authority of the Texas Department of Agriculture's Structural Pest Control Service.
Title
Requesting the speaker to direct the House Agriculture and Livestock Committee to conduct an interim study reviewing the rules, regulations, and enforcement authority of the Texas Department of Agriculture's Structural Pest Control Service.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#1812 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2017-05-10 | House | Filed |