TX HR204 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Gary Jessee for his service to the Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Honoring Gary Jessee for his service to the Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-07 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-03 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-08-02 | House | Filed |