TX HR2033 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the grand opening of The Link Event and Recreation Center in Richland Hills on April 29, 2017.
Title
Commemorating the grand opening of The Link Event and Recreation Center in Richland Hills on April 29, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed |