TX HR1997 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Texas Medical Association for its Ernest and Sarah Butler Awards for Excellence in Science Teaching program.
Title
Recognizing the Texas Medical Association for its Ernest and Sarah Butler Awards for Excellence in Science Teaching program.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed |