TX HR1968 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Dr. Norman Lee Robinson, senior pastor of Mount Olive Baptist Church in Arlington.
Title
In memory of Dr. Norman Lee Robinson, senior pastor of Mount Olive Baptist Church in Arlington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-06 | House | Filed |