TX HR1954 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of U.S. Army Lieutenant General (Ret.) Harold Gregory Moore Jr. of Auburn, Alabama.
Title
In memory of U.S. Army Lieutenant General (Ret.) Harold Gregory Moore Jr. of Auburn, Alabama.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-05 | House | Filed |