TX HR1952 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating LaTreshia Hamilton on her graduation from the Loyola University New Orleans College of Law.
Title
Congratulating LaTreshia Hamilton on her graduation from the Loyola University New Orleans College of Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-05 | House | Filed |