TX HR1941 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jose Perez of the Pharr Fire Department on being named Firefighter of the Year by the Rio Grande Valley Firefighter's and Fire Marshals' Association.
Title
Congratulating Jose Perez of the Pharr Fire Department on being named Firefighter of the Year by the Rio Grande Valley Firefighter's and Fire Marshals' Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-05 | House | Filed |