TX HR1934 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Granting the Texas DeMolay Association permission to use the house chamber on February 20 and 21, 2010.
Title
Granting the Texas DeMolay Association permission to use the house chamber on February 20 and 21, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to House Administration | |
2009-05-08 | Filed |