TX HR1929 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Jorge Silva on being named the 2022-2023 Teacher of the Year at Keys Academy in the Socorro Independent School District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Jorge Silva on being named the 2022-2023 Teacher of the Year at Keys Academy in the Socorro Independent School District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-25HouseAdopted
2023-05-25HouseLaid before the House
2023-05-25HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-05-23HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-17HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-05-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback