TX HR1926 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Lee F. Jackson on his retirement as chancellor of the University of North Texas System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Lee F. Jackson on his retirement as chancellor of the University of North Texas System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-12HouseAdopted
2017-05-12HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-05-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback