TX HR1922 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring La Union del Pueblo Entero (LUPE) for its 10 years of service to colonia residents in Hidalgo County.
Title
Honoring La Union del Pueblo Entero (LUPE) for its 10 years of service to colonia residents in Hidalgo County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-07 | House | Filed |