TX HR1921 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Monitor newspaper of McAllen on its receipt of numerous awards at the 2013 Texas Associated Press Managing Editors conference.
Title
Congratulating the Monitor newspaper of McAllen on its receipt of numerous awards at the 2013 Texas Associated Press Managing Editors conference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-07 | House | Filed |