TX HR1917 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Julie Gomez on being named the 2021 Teacher of the Year at Kimbrough Middle School in Mesquite ISD.
Title
Congratulating Julie Gomez on being named the 2021 Teacher of the Year at Kimbrough Middle School in Mesquite ISD.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-31 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-31 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-30 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-28 | House | Filed |