TX HR1914 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Congratulating Caitlin Smith of Crawford High School on being named a Commended Student in the 2008 National Merit Scholarship Program.
Title
Congratulating Caitlin Smith of Crawford High School on being named a Commended Student in the 2008 National Merit Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-14 | Adopted | |
2009-05-14 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-07 | Filed |