TX HR191 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-11)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the Armenian genocide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the Armenian genocide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Adopted RV#1354 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAdopted
2017-05-19HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
2017-01-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback