TX HR191 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing January 27, 2015, as Laredo Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing January 27, 2015, as Laredo Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-01-27 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-01-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LAREDO DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates