TX HR1901 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Myranda Flores of West Oso High School on her receipt of a 2017 Education to Employment Partners Scholarship.
Title
Congratulating Myranda Flores of West Oso High School on her receipt of a 2017 Education to Employment Partners Scholarship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Filed |